US HB8038 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1160, H.R. 8038 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1160, H.R. 8038 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the President to impose certain sanctions with respect to Russia and Iran, and for other purposes.
Title
21st Century Peace through Strength Act MAHSA Act Mahsa Amini Human rights and Security Accountability Act SHIP Act Stop Harboring Iranian Petroleum Act Protecting Americans’ Data from Foreign Adversaries Act of 2024 Protecting Americans from Foreign Adversary Controlled Applications Act FEND Off Fentanyl Act Fentanyl Eradication and Narcotics Deterrence Off Fentanyl Fight CRIME Act Fight and Combat Rampant Iranian Missile Exports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-20 - House - On Passage RC# 145 (Y: 360 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment: Nunn of Iowa Part E Amendment No. 2 RC# 144 (Y: 249 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment: Nunn of Iowa Part E Amendment No. 2 RC# 144 (Y: 249 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1160, H.R. 8038 is laid on the table. |
2024-04-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-20 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 360 - 58 (Roll no. 145). |
2024-04-20 | House | The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2024-04-20 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-04-20 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 8038. |
2024-04-20 | House | The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration. |
2024-04-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2615-2617) |
2024-04-20 | House | Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 8038 as unfinished business. |
2024-04-20 | House | On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-04-20 | House | Mr. McCaul moved that the committee rise. |
2024-04-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Nunn (IA) amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Meeks demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-04-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1160, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Nunn (IA) amendment No. 2. |
2024-04-20 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1160, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gimenez amendment No. 1. |
2024-04-20 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with 30 minutes of general debate on H.R. 8038. |
2024-04-20 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Virginia Foxx to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2024-04-20 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 1160 and Rule XVIII. |
2024-04-20 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8034, H.R. 8035, H.R. 8036 and H.R. 8038. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8034 under a closed rule and H.R. 8035, H.R. 8036, and H.R. 8038 under a structured rule. Provides for 30 minutes of general debate and one motion recommit on each bill. Rule also provides that upon disposition of the bills under consideration, the House will be considered to have taken from the Speaker's table H.R. 815 and to have concurred in the Senate amendment with an amendment inserting the texts of all bills as passed by the House, if passed. |
2024-04-20 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1160. (consideration: CR H2561-2587; text: CR H2565-2585) |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule H. Res. 1160 passed House. (consideration: CR H2563-2587; text: CR H2565-2585) |
2024-04-19 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1160 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8034, H.R. 8035, H.R. 8036 and H.R. 8038. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8034 under a closed rule and H.R. 8035, H.R. 8036, and H.R. 8038 under a structured rule. Provides for 30 minutes of general debate and one motion recommit on each bill. Rule also provides that upon disposition of the bills under consideration, the House will be considered to have taken from the Speaker's table H.R. 815 and to have concurred in the Senate amendment with an amendment inserting the texts of all bills as passed by the House, if passed. |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Armed Services, the Budget, Rules, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1160 (Related) 2024-04-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB815 (Related) 2024-04-24 - Became Public Law No: 118-50.
HB3152 (Related) 2023-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB6322 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 13.
HB5923 (Related) 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6603 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6245 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4681 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5917 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB815 (Related) 2024-04-24 - Became Public Law No: 118-50.
HB3152 (Related) 2023-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB6322 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 13.
HB5923 (Related) 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6603 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6245 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4681 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5917 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.