US HCR109 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the recognition of September 26, 2022, as "World Contraception Day" and expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding global and domestic access to contraception.
Title
Expressing support for the recognition of September 26, 2022, as "World Contraception Day" and expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding global and domestic access to contraception.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR685 (Related) 2021-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/109/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres109/BILLS-117hconres109ih.pdf |