US HCR123 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a correction in the enrollment of H.R. 1437.
Title
Providing for a correction in the enrollment of H.R. 1437.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7242) |
2022-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9815) |
2022-12-14 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. |
2022-12-14 | House | Ms. DeLauro asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. (consideration: CR H9815) |
2022-12-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-12-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1437 (Related) 2022-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-229.