US HJR152 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Hazardous and Solid Waste Management System: Disposal of Coal Combustion Residuals From Electric Utilities; Legacy CCR Surface Impoundments".
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Hazardous and Solid Waste Management System: Disposal of Coal Combustion Residuals From Electric Utilities; Legacy CCR Surface Impoundments".
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] |
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials. |
2024-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR174 (Same As) 2024-07-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SJR95 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SJR95 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-joint-resolution/152/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hjres152/BILLS-118hjres152ih.pdf |