US HR1227 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the development of a strategy to counter the rise in violent crime across the United States.
Title
Urging the development of a strategy to counter the rise in violent crime across the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Mayra Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR656 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759)
SR636 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2522-2523)
SR636 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2522-2523)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1227/BILLS-117hres1227ih.pdf |