US HR1244 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 124.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 124.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to any COVID-19 vaccine.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to any COVID-19 vaccine.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 124. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-516. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |