US HR1330 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-09-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR494 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR477 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9126; text: CR S9124-9125)
SR868 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
SR477 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9126; text: CR S9124-9125)
SR868 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1330/BILLS-117hres1330ih.pdf |