US HR1386 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of the week of September 26 through September 30, 2022, as "National Clean Energy Week".
Title
Supporting the designation of the week of September 26 through September 30, 2022, as "National Clean Energy Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2022-09-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR668 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SR381 (Related) 2021-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6666; text: CR S6678-6679)
SR794 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5031; text: CR S4974)
SR381 (Related) 2021-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6666; text: CR S6678-6679)
SR794 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5031; text: CR S4974)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1386/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1386/BILLS-117hres1386ih.pdf |