US HR425 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of July 19, 2023, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Title
Supporting the designation of July 19, 2023, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR257 (Related) 2023-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2127-2128; text: CR S2127)
SR735 (Related) 2024-06-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4096; text: CR S4090)
SR735 (Related) 2024-06-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4096; text: CR S4090)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/425/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres425/BILLS-118hres425ih.pdf |