US HR505 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Offers the condolences of the House of Representatives to the family of Dr. George Tiller. Declares that the House commits to the American principle that tolerance must always be superior to intolerance, and that violence is never an appropriate response to a difference in beliefs.
Title
Condemning the murder of Dr. George Tiller, who was shot to death at his church on May 31, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 316). (text: CR H6320) | |
2009-06-09 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6357-6358) | |
2009-06-09 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-06-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 505. | |
2009-06-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6320-6325) | |
2009-06-09 | Mr. Nadler (NY) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR187 (Related) 2009-06-17 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6730)
Subjects
Abortion
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Health personnel
Kansas
Violent crime
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Health personnel
Kansas
Violent crime