US HR616 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4800) making appropriations for Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies programs for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2015, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4457) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend increased expensing limitations, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4453) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the reduced recognition period for built-in gains of S corporations.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4800) making appropriations for Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies programs for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2015, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4457) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend increased expensing limitations, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4453) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the reduced recognition period for built-in gains of S corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 227 N: 189 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 224 N: 194 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 224 N: 194 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 189 (Roll no. 299). (consideration: CR H5259) |
2014-06-11 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 194 (Roll no. 298). (consideration: CR H5264) |
2014-06-11 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H. Res. 616. |
2014-06-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 616. |
2014-06-11 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5259-5265) |
2014-06-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 111. |
2014-06-10 | House | Rule provides for one hour of general debate on the bills. H.R. 4800 shall be considred for amendment under a modified open rule. H.R. 4457 and H.R. 4453 shall be considred for amendment under a closed rule. |
2014-06-10 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-472, by Mr. Burgess. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4453 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433.
HB4457 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
HB4800 (Related) 2014-06-11 - Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 4800 as unfinished business.
HB4457 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
HB4800 (Related) 2014-06-11 - Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 4800 as unfinished business.