US HR902 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of January 28, 2010, as National Data Privacy Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of January 28, 2010, as National Data Privacy Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-07 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection. | |
2009-11-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR31 (Related) 2009-01-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR25 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1005; text as passed Senate: CR S1005; text of measure as introduced: CR S998)
SR402 (Related) 2010-01-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S359; text as passed Senate: CR S359; text of measure as introduced: CR S358-359)
SR25 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1005; text as passed Senate: CR S1005; text of measure as introduced: CR S998)
SR402 (Related) 2010-01-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S359; text as passed Senate: CR S359; text of measure as introduced: CR S358-359)
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Internet and video services
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/902/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres902/BILLS-111hres902ih.pdf |