US SB1499 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 278 Main Street in Chadron, Nebraska, as the "Sergeant Cory Mracek Memorial Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 278 Main Street in Chadron, Nebraska, as the "Sergeant Cory Mracek Memorial Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-192. |
2014-11-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-11-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8007) |
2014-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1499. |
2014-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8007-8008) |
2014-11-17 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2013-11-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7964; text as passed Senate: CR S7964) |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239. |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Nebraska
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Nebraska
Postal service