US SB2260 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the improvement of domestic infrastructure in order to prevent marine debris, and for other purposes.
Title
Save Our Seas 2.0: Improving Domestic Infrastructure to Prevent Marine Debris Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 224. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3969 (Related) 2019-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1982 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-224. (TXT | PDF)
SB1982 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-224. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Chemistry
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Marine pollution
Product development and innovation
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
Air quality
Chemistry
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Marine pollution
Product development and innovation
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply