US SB3008 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Todd Graham Pain Management Improvement Act of 2018 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to publish a report on whether Medicare payments, coverage, and coding policies for non-opioid pain management treatments should be revised. The report must include an analysis of pain management and prescribing guidelines, access to non-opioid treatments, and the effect of any recommended changes on Medicare and enrollee opioid addiction.
Title
Dr. Todd Graham Pain Management Improvement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5722 (Same As) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB5776 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-764, Part I.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB5776 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-764, Part I.
HB6110 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Medicare
Mental health
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Medicare
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3008/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3008/BILLS-115s3008is.pdf |