US SB3933 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Homeland Security to take into custody aliens who have been charged in the United States with theft, and for other purposes.
Title
Laken Riley Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7322 (Related) 2024-04-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360.
HB7334 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10.
HB7511 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
HB7334 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10.
HB7511 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3933/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3933/BILLS-118s3933is.pdf |