US SB403 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
North Country National Scenic Trail Route Adjustment Act (Sec. 2) Amends the National Trails System Act to extend the North Country National Scenic Trail into Vermont. (Sec. 3) Prohibits any land or interest outside of the exterior boundary of any federally administered area from being acquired by the federal government for the Trail by condemnation.
Title
North Country National Scenic Trail Route Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 114-125. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-338. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB799 (Same As) 2016-11-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.