US SB41 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-13 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-13 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the READ Act.
Title
READ Act Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-11-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5363; text: CR S5363) |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S76) |
Same As/Similar To
HB681 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.