US SB820 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes grants that support state and local efforts to process DNA evidence in rape kits. Specifically, it reauthorizes through FY2024 the following: grants under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program; grants to provide DNA training and education for law enforcement personnel, corrections personnel, and court officers; and grants under the Sexual Assault Forensic Exam Program.
Title
Debbie Smith Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2946-2948; text: CR S2947-2948) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 80. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with amendments. Without written report. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-104. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime