US SJR32 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-10 - Senate - On Overriding the Veto S.J.Res. 32 RC# 5 (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - House - On Passage RC# 690 (Y: 221 N: 202 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution S.J.Res. 32 RC# 260 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-12-01 - House - On Passage RC# 690 (Y: 221 N: 202 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution S.J.Res. 32 RC# 260 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Senate | Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S66-67) |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text: CR S6048) |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Vetoed by President. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2023-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-01 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 202, 1 Present (Roll no. 690). (text: CR H6055) |
2023-12-01 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2023-12-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 32. |
2023-12-01 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32. |
2023-12-01 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H6055-6062) |
2023-11-29 | House | Rule H. Res. 891 passed House. |
2023-11-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32. |
2023-10-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-10-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 260. (consideration: CR S5055, S5061-5062; text: CR S5062) |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228. |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR50 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HJR66 (Related) 2023-11-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HJR85 (Same As) 2023-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HR891 (Related) 2023-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR66 (Related) 2023-11-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HJR85 (Same As) 2023-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HR891 (Related) 2023-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.