US SR112 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S807; text: CR S805-806)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S807; text: CR S805-806)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of February 27 through March 3, 2023, as "Public Schools Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 27 through March 3, 2023, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S807; text: CR S805-806) |
Same As/Similar To
HR173 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HR1032 (Related) 2024-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SR568 (Related) 2024-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1047; text: CR S1046-1047)
HR1032 (Related) 2024-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SR568 (Related) 2024-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1047; text: CR S1046-1047)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/112/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres112/BILLS-118sres112ats.pdf |