US SR568 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1047; text: CR S1046-1047)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1047; text: CR S1046-1047)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of February 26 through March 1, 2024, as "Public Schools Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 26 through March 1, 2024, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1047; text: CR S1046-1047) |
Same As/Similar To
HR173 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HR1032 (Related) 2024-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SR112 (Related) 2023-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S807; text: CR S805-806)
HR1032 (Related) 2024-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SR112 (Related) 2023-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S807; text: CR S805-806)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/568/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres568/BILLS-118sres568ats.pdf |