US SR269 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 19, 2021, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States.
Title
A resolution designating June 19, 2021, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548) |
Same As/Similar To
HR480 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR679 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974)
HR1182 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR679 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974)
HR1182 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/269/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres269/BILLS-117sres269ats.pdf |