US SR279 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4633)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4633)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 21, 2021 through June 25, 2021, as "National Cybersecurity Education Week".
Title
A resolution designating June 21, 2021 through June 25, 2021, as "National Cybersecurity Education Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4633) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4795-4796) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S4633) |