US SR444 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799) |
Same As/Similar To
HR759 (Same As) 2021-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1306 (Related) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
HR1306 (Related) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/444/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres444/BILLS-117sres444ats.pdf |