US HR1306 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the support of the House of Representatives for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and its deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Title
Expressing the support of the House of Representatives for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and its deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR759 (Related) 2021-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR444 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799)
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
SR444 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799)
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1306/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1306/BILLS-117hres1306ih.pdf |