UT HB0006 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Infrastructure and General Government Base Budget
Title
Infrastructure and General Government Base Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-02-01 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-02-01 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-29 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Administrative Services
Department of Human Resource Management
Department of Technology Services
Department of Transportation
Government Operations (State Issues)
Public Budgeting
Public Utilities & Technology
Transportation
Department of Administrative Services
Department of Human Resource Management
Department of Technology Services
Department of Transportation
Government Operations (State Issues)
Public Budgeting
Public Utilities & Technology
Transportation