UT HB0084 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0084S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District Amendments
Title
School District Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTREV |
2014-02-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2014-02-03 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0084S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0084.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0084.pdf |