UT HB0098 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Offense Amendments
Title
Sexual Offense Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Domestic Violence
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Victims