UT HB0098 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm Access Amendments
Title
Firearm Access Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-12-29 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-29 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Defenses
Fines
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Mental Health
Public Safety
Punishment
Self Defense
Suicide
Weapons
Defenses
Fines
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Mental Health
Public Safety
Punishment
Self Defense
Suicide
Weapons