UT HB0113 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Rural County Jail Facilities Tax
Title
Rural County Jail Facilities Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Rex Shipp [R] | Sen. Evan Vickers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-13 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Correctional Facilities
County and Municipal Finance
Local Option Sales Taxes
Local Taxation and Fees
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
County and Municipal Finance
Local Option Sales Taxes
Local Taxation and Fees
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax