UT HB0229 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety Answering Point Amendments
Title
Public Safety Answering Point Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Emergency Management
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Utilities and Technology
Utah Communications Authority
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Utilities and Technology
Utah Communications Authority