UT HB0266 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amber Alert Amendments
Title
Amber Alert Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-21 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-21 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-02-17 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-17 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-02 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2023-02-02 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Bureau of Criminal Investigation
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Kidnapping
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
New Rulemaking Authority
Bureau of Criminal Investigation
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Kidnapping
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
New Rulemaking Authority