UT HB0292 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Grading - Calculation of High School Graduation Rate
Title
School Grading - Calculation of High School Graduation Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-13 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDU |
2014-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2014-02-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2014-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |