UT HB0434 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Station Area Plan Amendments
Title
Station Area Plan Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-02 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Housing
Land Use
Municipalities
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Transit
Transportation
Land Use
Municipalities
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Transit
Transportation
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0434.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0434.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0434.fn.pdf |