UT HB3001 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex-designated Interscholastic Athletics Indemnification
Title
Sex-designated Interscholastic Athletics Indemnification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-29 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-29 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-25 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar Table |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-03-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-25 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ substitute adoption failed from # 2 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-03-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-03-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |