UT HCR006 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Covid-19 Efforts
Title
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Covid-19 Efforts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-02-05 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in House Special Orders Calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health
Diseases Control and Prevention
Health
Health Care Data and Informatics
Local Health Departments
Public Health
Public Health Laboratory
Resolutions
Diseases Control and Prevention
Health
Health Care Data and Informatics
Local Health Departments
Public Health
Public Health Laboratory
Resolutions