UT HJR003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution Changing an Interim Committee Name
Title
Joint Rules Resolution Changing an Interim Committee Name
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-02-26 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-26 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-25 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-25 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-03 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-12 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |