UT SB0028 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Construction Code Amendments
Title
State Construction Code Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-14 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-14 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-08 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-02-07 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-07 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-07 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-02-06 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-06 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2012-02-03 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2012-02-03 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2012-02-02 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-31 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-31 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPUT | |
2012-01-26 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-25 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO | |
2012-01-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2011-11-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-11-21 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |