UT SB0181 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Referenda Amendments
Title
Local Referenda Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |