VA HB1011 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure in land use proceedings; statewide application. Alters certain land use disclosure requirements applicable to officials in any county with the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) by replacing "relationship of employee-employer, agent-principal, or attorney-client" with the broader phrase of "business or financial interest." The bill makes the same change to existing provisions that currently apply only to Loudoun County and applies the change statewide.
Title
Land use proceedings; disclosure, statewide application.
Sponsors
Del. Ian Lovejoy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103220D |