VA HB1030 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Officer-involved shootings; model policy for investigations; disclosure of report. Provides that an attorney for the Commonwealth shall disclose a report of his findings for any "officer-involved shooting" if no criminal charges are brought against a law-enforcement officer, or, alternatively, if charges are brought, the attorney for the Commonwealth shall issue a statement disclosing the general purpose of bringing such charges or seeking an indictment. The bill directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services to develop a model policy regarding the investigation of an officer-involved shooting.
Title
Officer-involved shootings; model policy for investigations, disclosure of report.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101842D |