VA HB1040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1040
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Naturopathic doctors; license required. Requires the Board of Medicine to license and regulate naturopathic doctors, defined in the bill as an individual, other than a doctor of medicine, osteopathy, chiropractic, or podiatry, who may diagnose, treat, and help prevent diseases using a system of practice that is based on the natural healing capacity of individuals, using physiological, psychological, or physical methods, and who may also use natural medicines, prescriptions, legend drugs, foods, herbs, or other natural remedies, including light and air.
Title
Naturopathic doctors; Board of Medicine to license and regulate.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104929D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2956.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2956.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2973.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |