VA HB1043 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit exchanges; regulation of navigators. Requires navigators, on and after September 1, 2014, to be registered with the State Corporation Commission, in addition to being certified by the federal Department of Health and Human Services (HHS). The measure prohibits navigators from receiving compensation for services when prohibited by federal law. The Commission shall register a navigator if his character and general fitness warrant belief that he will act fairly, in the public interest, and in accordance with law. Navigators are required to submit an application to the Commission in a form the Commission prescribes, pay an application fee, and provide a criminal record history. The Commission is authorized to examine and investigate those involved in navigator activities and requires them to report to the Commission (i) any action taken by HHS, (ii) any felony conviction, and (iii) any administrative action taken in another jurisdiction or by another governmental agency in the Commonwealth. The Commission may determine whether the federal standards and qualifications for navigators are sufficient to ensure that navigators can perform their required duties. If the Commission finds that they are not, it is required to make a good faith effort to work in cooperation with the U.S. Secretary of HHS to propose improvements. If the Commission determines the standards and qualifications remain insufficient, the Commission is directed to adopt the necessary regulations to ensure that navigators can perform their required duties.
Title
Health benefit exchanges; regulation of navigators.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] |
Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 769 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1043ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103161D |
Same As/Similar To
SB542 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3457 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |