VA HB1043 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; recommendations on background check and training requirements for youth sports coaches and staff. Directs the Department of Education to make recommendations regarding appropriate background check and training requirements for coaches, staff members, and other volunteers of competitive sports leagues in which persons under the age of 18 participate. The bill requires the Department of Education to consult with child sexual assault victims advocates and youth competitive sports leagues in making its recommendations and to submit to the Governor and General Assembly a report of its recommendations by November 1, 2022. Department of Education; recommendations on background check and training requirements for youth sports coaches and staff. Directs the Department of Education to make recommendations regarding appropriate background check and training requirements for coaches, staff members, and other volunteers of competitive sports leagues in which persons under the age of 18 participate. The bill requires the Department of Education to consult with child sexual assault victims advocates and youth competitive sports leagues in making its recommendations and to submit to the Governor and General Assembly a report of its recommendations by November 1, 2022.
Title
Youth sports leagues; background checks and training requirements for coaches and staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2022-03-16 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chair rules the bill is not properly before the Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker ruled amendment by Senate not germane |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1043H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105603D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105603D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104009D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |