VA HB1067 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Continued to 2017 in Appropriations with substitute by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Continued to 2017 in Appropriations with substitute by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds; tolls on I-66. Authorizes the Treasury Board to issue bonds pursuant to Article X, Section 9 (c) of the Constitution of Virginia in an amount up to $1.5 billion plus financing costs to finance the costs of acquiring, constructing, and equipping dynamically tolled lanes on a portion of Interstate 66. Issuance of the bonds is contingent on the Transportation Public-Private Partnership Advisory Committee, prior to January 1, 2018, finding that the issuance is necessary due to the inability of private parties to meet the term sheet published by the Department of Transportation in September 2015 pursuant to the procurement initiated under the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995.
Title
Bonds; tolls on I-66.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Continued to 2017 in Appropriations with substitute by voice vote |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed to Web only 16104715D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103031D |