VA HB1078 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Family caregiver tax credit. Creates a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2024 through 2028 for expenses incurred by an individual in caring for an eligible family member, defined in the bill, who requires assistance with one or more activities of daily living, also defined in the bill. The credit equals 50 percent of eligible expenditures incurred by the caregiver up to $1,000. In order to qualify for the credit, the family caregiver must (i) not receive any compensation or reimbursement for the eligible expenditures and (ii) have federal adjusted gross income that is no greater than $100,000 for an individual or $200,000 for married persons. The bill requires the Tax Commissioner to establish guidelines for claiming the credit and provides that any unused credit may be carried forward by the taxpayer for five taxable years following the taxable year for which the credit was issued.
Title
Family caregiver; creates a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2024 through 2028.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Jackie Glass [D] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100467D |