VA HB1095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax rate reduction. Reduces the top marginal individual income tax rate from 5.75 percent on income in excess of $17,000 to five percent on income in excess of $5,000 beginning with taxable year 2017.
Title
Income tax, state; reduces top marginal individual tax rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102774D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1095 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1095+hil |