VA HB1109 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Problem Gambling Treatment Fund established. Establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment Fund for the prevention and treatment of gambling addiction and other problems related to gambling, and for the administration of such programs. The Fund shall receive four-tenths of one percent (0.4%) from the State Lottery Fund, the State Racing Operations Fund (horse racing), and the revenue received by the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services from charitable gaming permit and registration application fees. The bill also allows advertising that says lottery proceeds benefit the prevention and treatment of gambling addiction and other problems related to gambling. The bill contains technical amendments. By its terms, the bill becomes effective on January 1, 2013.
Title
Problem Gambling Treatment Fund; established.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Robert Brink [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2012-02-03 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103407D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Taxation
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 312.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 312.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 370.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1109 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1109+hil |