VA HB1109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; combined reporting requirements; disclosures. Requires, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, unitary combined reporting for Virginia corporate income tax purposes. The bill also requires corporations, beginning with taxable year 2020, to submit a public disclosure report to the Department of Taxation with certain data related to their state taxes, which will be redacted to hide their identities prior to publication.
Title
Income tax, corporate; combined reporting requirements, disclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101799D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 429 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 441.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 443 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |